05/21/2012 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |||
05/21/2012 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/15/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/14/2012 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
02/28/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |||
02/28/2012 | Prefiled. |