|
05/23/2012
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 16 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/16/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|