04/04/2012 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 49. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
03/29/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/4/2012. | |||
03/29/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
03/29/2012 | Rules suspended. | |||
03/28/2012 | Reported favorably (6-1) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
02/28/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
02/28/2012 | Prefiled. |