04/11/2012 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/04/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/11/2012. | |||
04/04/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/03/2012 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
02/28/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
02/28/2012 | Prefiled. |