|
06/07/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 571.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/18/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|