03/29/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |||
03/28/2012 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
03/28/2012 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/22/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/28/2012. | |||
03/20/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
03/19/2012 | Reported with amendments (17-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
02/29/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |||
02/29/2012 | Prefiled. |