04/26/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/18/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/26/2012. | |||
04/17/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported favorably (13-0-1) (Local and Consent). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
02/29/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |||
02/29/2012 | Prefiled. |