04/10/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |||
04/09/2012 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
04/09/2012 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/03/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/9/2012. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/02/2012 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |||
01/30/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |||
01/23/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |||
01/23/2012 | Prefiled. |