|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|