|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 44. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Reported without amendments (8-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Reported with amendments (11-6) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|