|
05/23/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/12/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Reported favorably (15-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|