03/29/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
03/27/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/29/2012. | |||
03/22/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/28/2012. | |||
03/21/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
03/20/2012 | Reported with amendments (17-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
03/01/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |||
03/01/2012 | Prefiled. |