|
05/24/2012
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 10 yeas and 26 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|