|
05/25/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 272.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/21/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 3/26/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Reported favorably (17-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|