04/17/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |||
04/16/2012 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
04/12/2012 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/04/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/12/2012. | |||
04/04/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |||
04/03/2012 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent). | |||
03/14/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
03/13/2012 | Read by title. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
03/01/2012 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |