|
05/31/2012
|
Effective date: May 31, 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 371.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 3/28/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/03/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|