04/23/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/12/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/23/2012. | |||
04/12/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/11/2012 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
03/02/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |||
03/02/2012 | Prefiled. |