05/21/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
05/17/2012 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 29. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/10/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/09/2012 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
03/02/2012 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
03/02/2012 | Prefiled. |