LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB807
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB807
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB807
Action History
05/03/2012
Becomes HB No. 1210.
05/02/2012
Reported by substitute (8-0) (Regular)
03/12/2012
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
03/03/2012
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
03/02/2012
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
03/02/2012
Prefiled.