|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported without amendments (12-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Reported with amendments (24-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|