|
06/15/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 15, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|