05/21/2012 | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |||
05/03/2012 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/26/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2012. | |||
04/24/2012 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |||
04/23/2012 | Reported with amendments (13-0-1) (Local and Consent). | |||
03/27/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |||
03/26/2012 | Read by title. | |||
03/03/2012 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |||
03/02/2012 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |