|
05/17/2012
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/16/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Reported with amendments (14-3) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/10/2012.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|