|
06/13/2012
|
Effective date: August 1, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 812.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/23/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2012
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|