|
06/13/2012
|
Effective date: July 1, 2013.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 814.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2012
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Reported favorably (21-0) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|