|
06/08/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 8, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/3/2012.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title.
|
|
|