05/24/2012 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
05/23/2012 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/22/2012 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/22/2012 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
05/21/2012 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
05/16/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
04/25/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
04/24/2012 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |