|
05/31/2012
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/29/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|