|
05/24/2012
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 5 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 64, nays 23. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/16/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|