06/01/2012 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/01/2012 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/31/2012 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/30/2012 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
05/29/2012 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/24/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |||
05/23/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/22/2012 | Reported favorably (15-0). | |||
05/01/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |