05/10/2012 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
05/07/2012 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/07/2012 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/02/2012 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
05/01/2012 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |