05/31/2012 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
05/30/2012 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/29/2012 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/29/2012 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
05/28/2012 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
05/24/2012 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/24/2012 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/23/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2012. | |||
05/22/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/21/2012 | Reported favorably (13-0). | |||
05/08/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |||
05/07/2012 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |