05/21/2012 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
05/14/2012 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/09/2012 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/08/2012 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
05/08/2012 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
05/07/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |||
04/02/2012 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
04/02/2012 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
03/27/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/2/2012. | |||
03/21/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
03/20/2012 | Reported favorably (15-0). | |||
03/13/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |||
03/12/2012 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | |||
03/02/2012 | Prefiled. |