|
05/10/2012
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/2/2012.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Reported favorably (13-0-1).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|