Louisiana 2012 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR31 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 12RS-1474	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2012
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 31
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
NATURAL RESOURCES DEPT: Approves the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for FY
2012-2013
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON1
To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2012-2013, as adopted2
by the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection3
and Restoration Authority.4
WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and5
responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the6
Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion7
Board; and8
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Annual Basin Plan is9
essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and10
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Annual Basin Plan was11
fostered by public meetings that were held on August 9, 2011, in Morgan City, Louisiana,12
on August 10, 2011, in Plaquemine, Louisiana, and on August 17, 2011, in St. Martinville,13
Louisiana, to elicit public suggestions for projects to be considered for the Annual Basin14
Plan; and15
WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a Technical Advisory Group has been16
appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects17
proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for18
inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan, and make recommendations to the Atchafalaya Basin19
Research and Promotion Board; and20 HLS 12RS-1474	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 31
Page 2 of 3
WHEREAS, water quality projects that were suggested by the public were reviewed,1
evaluated, and selected projects approved for inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan by the2
Technical Advisory Group as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B) and presented with the Draft3
Annual Basin Plan for review at public meetings held on November 14, 2011, in Morgan4
City, November 16, 2011, in Plaquemine, and November 17, 2011, in St. Martinville; and5
 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public6
meeting held on December 1, 2011, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana,  after receiving and7
considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin8
Program staff, unanimously approved the Draft Annual Basin Plan; and9
WHEREAS, the Annual Basin Plan was submitted on January 18, 2012, to the10
Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11(E) for11
their review and approval as consistent with the Master Plan for Coastal Protection and12
Restoration for a Sustainable Coast and was unanimously approved by the CPRA at that13
meeting; and14
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board, as required by15
R.S. 30:2000.11(D) at a public meeting held on January 26, 2012, considered and16
unanimously approved the proposed Annual Basin Plan, as modified; and17
WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual18
Basin Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Annual Basin Plan by19
resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and20
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan shall not be effective or21
implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to22
disapprove the annual plan; and23
WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan24
if the legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.25
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby26
approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2012-2013, as presented27
by the secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya28
Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.29 HLS 12RS-1474	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 31
Page 3 of 3
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the1
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and2
Promotion Board.3
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
St. Germain	HCR No. 31
Approves the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for FY 2012-2013 as adopted by the
Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and
Restoration Authority.