Louisiana 2012 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR31 Enrolled / Bill

                    ENROLLED
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2012
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON NO. 31
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTI ON
To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2012-2013, as adopted
by the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection
and Restoration Authority.
WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and
responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the
Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion
Board; and
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Annual Basin Plan is
essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and
WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Annual Basin Plan was
fostered by public meetings that were held on August 9, 2011, in Morgan City, Louisiana,
on August 10, 2011, in Plaquemine, Louisiana, and on August 17, 2011, in St. Martinville,
Louisiana, to elicit public suggestions for projects to be considered for the Annual Basin
Plan; and
WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been
appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects
proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for
inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan, and make recommendations to the Atchafalaya Basin
Research and Promotion Board; and
WHEREAS, water quality projects that were suggested by the public were reviewed,
evaluated, and selected projects approved for inclusion in the Annual Basin Plan by the
technical advisory group as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B) and presented with the Draft
Annual Basin Plan for review at public meetings held on November 14, 2011, in Morgan
City, November 16, 2011, in Plaquemine, and November 17, 2011, in St. Martinville; and ENROLLEDHCR NO. 31
Page 2 of 2
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public
meeting held on December 1, 2011, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and
considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin
Program staff, unanimously approved the Draft Annual Basin Plan; and
WHEREAS, the Annual Basin Plan was submitted on January 18, 2012, to the
Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11(E) for
their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal protection and
restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by the CPRA at that
meeting; and
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board, as required by
R.S. 30:2000.11(D) at a public meeting held on January 26, 2012, considered and
unanimously approved the proposed Annual Basin Plan, as modified; and
WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual
Basin Plan, and the legislature may approve or disapprove the Annual Basin Plan by
resolution adopted by a majority vote of the members of each house of the legislature; and
WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan shall not be effective or
implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to
disapprove the annual plan; and
WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan
if the legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Basin Plan for Fiscal Year 2012-2013, as presented
by the secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya
Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and
Promotion Board.
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATI VES
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE