|
05/03/2012
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/12/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/5/2012.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Reported favorably (10-0-1).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|