05/24/2012 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
05/17/2012 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/15/2012 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/14/2012 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
05/14/2012 | Called from the Calendar. | |||
04/11/2012 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/04/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/27/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
03/26/2012 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
03/23/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |