05/16/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |||
05/15/2012 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |||
05/15/2012 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 87, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/09/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012. | |||
05/08/2012 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/07/2012 | Reported favorably (13-0). | |||
04/04/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |