06/04/2012 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/4/2012. | |||
06/04/2012 | Approved on 6/4/12. | |||
05/31/2012 | Study request list distributed to the members on 5/31/12. | |||
05/31/2012 | Request study by the committee on Retirement. | |||
05/31/2012 | Received by the Senate Office on 5/31/12. | |||
05/31/2012 | Sent to the Senate. | |||
05/29/2012 | Study request list distributed to members on 5/29/2012. | |||
05/22/2012 | Received on 5/21/2012. |