Louisiana 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR55 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            ENROLLED
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2012
HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 55
BY REPRESENTATIVE GIROD JACKSON
A RESOLUTION
To commend Reverend Doctor John Austin Brooks, Sr., upon the celebration of his seventy-
fifth birthday.
WHEREAS, on Friday, April 20, 2012, friends and family are gathering to celebrate
the seventy-fifth birthday of Reverend Doctor John Austin Brooks, Sr.; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Brooks merits a sincere measure of commendation for his
faithful and committed service to Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church in Harvey and the people
of the state of Louisiana; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Brooks was born to Reverend Clarence Ellis Brooks, Sr., and
Mrs. Bertha Lane Brooks on April 12, 1937, and baptized at Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church
on May 13, 1945; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Brooks graduated from McDonogh #35 High School, earned
an undergraduate degree from Dillard University of New Orleans in 1959, and received a
master of education degree from Nicholls State University in 1973, and master of divinity
and theology degrees from Union Baptist Theological Seminary in 1978 and 1981,
respectively, before being awarded an honorary doctorate of divinity degree in 1989; and
WHEREAS, on May 9, 1959, Reverend Brooks married his devoted wife, Kathleen
Lemon Brooks, with whom he has two children, Donita and John Brooks, Jr., six
grandchildren, and one great-grandchild; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Brooks was ordained on June 11, 1976, under the direction
of the Westside Missionary Baptist Association; and 
WHEREAS, after the death of his father, Reverend Clarence E. Brooks, Sr.,
Reverend Brooks was elected pastor of Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church and was installed on
August 13, 1976; and ENROLLEDHR NO. 55
Page 2 of 2
WHEREAS, Reverend Brooks has been a source of great inspiration for the people
of Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church; among his accomplishments are leading the drives to build
a new edifice in 1985 and the Mount Pilgrim Multipurpose Christian Center in 2005; and
WHEREAS, Reverend Brooks has served on numerous Christian boards and
committees and in various offices throughout the state and nation, including being a
founding member of the Gamma Rho Chapter of Omega Psi Phi Fraternity, Incorporated,
past president of the Westside Missionary Baptist Association, and a member of the
Louisiana Baptist State Convention and the National Baptist Association; and 
WHEREAS, Reverend Brooks has served faithfully and with distinction and has
provided steady, visionary leadership for his church and community and has been a mentor,
teacher, preacher, confidant, counselor, and brother to many. 
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the
Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend Reverend Doctor John Austin Brooks, Sr.,
upon his seventy-fifth birthday, does hereby recognize the spiritual leadership, inspiration,
and guidance that he provides to his church and community, and does hereby wish him and
his family full measures of success and happiness in the years to come.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted
to Reverend Doctor John Austin Brooks, Sr., of the Mount Pilgrim Baptist Church in
Harvey. 
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATI VES