LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
House
Bills
HSR2
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR2
Action History
04/30/2012
Approved on 4/27/2012.
04/24/2012
Study request list distributed to members on 4/24/2012.
04/11/2012
Received on 4/11/2012.