LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB1
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB1
Action History
05/02/2012
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
05/01/2012
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
04/30/2012
Reported with amendments.
03/12/2012
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
01/24/2012
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.