|
06/15/2012
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Becomes Act No. 872
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 5. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported with amendments (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Reported with amendments (7-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|