|
06/11/2012
|
Effective date 8/1/12.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 736.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
|
|
|