|
06/07/2012
|
Effective date 6/7/12.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 635.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|