05/03/2012 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
05/02/2012 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |||
05/02/2012 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 16 yeas and 13 nays. | |||
05/02/2012 | Called from the Involuntary Calendar by a vote of 16 yeas and 15 nays. | |||
05/02/2012 | Rules suspended | |||
04/17/2012 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Involuntary Calendar by a vote of 24 yeas and 9 nays. | |||
04/17/2012 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | |||
04/17/2012 | Called from the Calendar. | |||
04/09/2012 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/03/2012 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
04/02/2012 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/12/2012 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |||
02/28/2012 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |