|
06/04/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor on June 15, 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/06.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Notice Senate reconsidered and concurred in House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
House conferees appointed: Danahay, Tim Burns, and Miller.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrish, Amedee, and Murray.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported with amendments (7-2) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2012
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|