LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB233
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB233
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB233
Action History
04/10/2012
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
04/09/2012
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
04/04/2012
Reported favorably.
03/12/2012
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
02/28/2012
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.