05/10/2012 | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 765. | |||
05/09/2012 | Reported by substitute. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Insurance. | |||
05/02/2012 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
04/25/2012 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/12/2012 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |||
02/29/2012 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |